Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Bresson, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia

Titular Bishop of Cestrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1884BornLangogne, France
4 Jul 190925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
1 Jul 193753.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Jul 193753.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
3 Oct 193753.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
9 Nov 195672.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Apr 196782.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Bresson:
Bishop Edoardo Bresson S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013