Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Marie Chanrion, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Chariopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1865Born
27 Sep 188721.9ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
1889¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
1 Dec 190540.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Dec 190540.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
25 Mar 190640.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
3 Feb 193771.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)
17 Oct 194176.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie, New Caledonia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-Marie Chanrion
Bishop Claude-Marie Chanrion S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nouvelle-Calédonie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegnié, France

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast