Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Port-Vila

Dioecesis Portus Vilensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 June 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nouméa
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Vanuatu
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 11,870 (4,584 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 59, Port-Vila, Vanuatu
  • Telephone: 22640
  • Fax: 25342

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi}
9 February 1901ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi}
22 March 1904ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi} Vicariate Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi}
Diocese of Port-Vila
21 June 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi} Diocese of Port-Vila

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of New Hebrides {Isole Nouve Ebridi}
19504,91049,3899.9%171728849ap1951
Diocese of Port-Vila
197012,99577,98316.7%32326499329331ap1971
198016,725112,59614.9%22426643376117ap1981
199019,500146,00013.4%315181,0831276524ap1991
199926,500180,00014.7%1312251,0601305617ap2000
200028,000190,00014.7%1513281,0001366818ap2001
200128,600190,00015.1%1612281,0211356318ap2002
200228,800190,00015.2%1513281,0281376021ap2003
200329,100195,00014.9%1510251,1641306621ap2004
200429,500205,00014.4%1510251,1801326521ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013