Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Visi

Deceased

Bishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1954BornNingfire
15 Dec 198228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 199642.1AppointedBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
12 Apr 199742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)
19 May 200752.6DiedBishop of Port-Vila, Vanuatu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Michel Visi:
Bishop Michel Visi (born , died ) Bishop of Port-Vila

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013