Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Reiterer, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lydenburg-Witbank


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1908BornAvelengo-Hafling, Italy
29 Jun 193325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Feb 195648.0AppointedBishop of Lydenburg, South Africa
10 May 195648.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lydenburg, South Africa
25 Feb 198375.0RetiredBishop of Lydenburg-Witbank, South Africa
20 Feb 200092.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lydenburg-Witbank, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Anton Reiterer:
Bishop Anton Reiterer M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lydenburg-Witbank

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 36
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013