Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Maria Cardinal Corsi

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹Born
2 Sep 168653.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168653.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
7 Jul 168754.5AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Aug 168754.6Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
3 Dec 169663.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
6 Nov 169764.8DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Corsi (VIAF: 89112410)
Domenico Maria Cardinal Corsi (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini
Death PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 18
  • ob: AT, 28 May 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,415
  • c2+: AT, 6 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Jun 2020

Quantcast