Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Bőcskei

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1965 BornGataia
24 Jun 199025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Timişoara, Romania
23 Dec 200843.4AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
7 Mar 200943.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for László Bőcskei:
Bishop László Bőcskei (born ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,061

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013