Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berislav Grgić

Prelate of Tromsø, Norway


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1960 Born
29 Jun 198626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Banja Luka, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Dec 200848.8AppointedPrelate of Tromsø, Norway
28 Mar 200949.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Tromsø, Norway
29 Mar 200949.1InstalledPrelate of Tromsø, Norway

MicroData Summary for Berislav Grgić
Bishop Berislav Grgić (born ) Prelate of Tromsø

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovo Selo

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Tromsø.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,082

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast