Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Kimengich

Bishop of Eldoret, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1961 Born
14 Sep 198625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nakuru, Kenya
20 Mar 201048.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lodwar, Kenya
20 Mar 201048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
22 May 201049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
5 Mar 201149.8AppointedBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
16 Nov 201958.5AppointedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
1 Feb 202058.7InstalledBishop of Eldoret, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Dominic Kimengich
Bishop Dominic Kimengich (born ) Bishop of Eldoret

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKituro
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Augustine, Cathedral, Lodwar, Diocese of Lodwar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eldoret.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,644
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2019
  • i: CB, 26 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast