Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Kimbondo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kisantu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1914BornMvunzu
8 Aug 194329.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Aug 195642.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Aug 195642.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebela
18 Nov 195642.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebela
24 Jun 196147.3AppointedBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Nov 197157.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Apr 197359.1ResignedBishop of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jul 197763.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kisantu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Pierre Kimbondo:
Archbishop Pierre Kimbondo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kisantu

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015