Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop RaphaŽl Lubaki Nganga

Deceased

Bishop of Matadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1934BornMindouli
23 Jun 196329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Apr 197137.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Apr 197137.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
4 Jul 197137.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
8 Mar 198551.2SucceededBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
26 Mar 198753.2DiedBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for RaphaŽl Lubaki Nganga:
Bishop RaphaŽl Lubaki Nganga (born , died ) Bishop of Matadi

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013