Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon N’Zita Wa Ne Malanda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Matadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1908BornNkungi
18 Aug 194031.8Ordained PriestPriest of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Nov 196052.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Nov 196052.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gindarus
12 Feb 196152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gindarus
18 Dec 196557.1AppointedBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Jan 196657.2InstalledBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Mar 198576.3RetiredBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Dec 199183.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Simon N’Zita Wa Ne Malanda:
Bishop Simon N’Zita Wa Ne Malanda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Matadi

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015