Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Mbadu Kikhela Kupika

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Belesasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1932Born
11 Apr 195927.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Apr 195927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Jan 197542.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Jan 197542.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zica
17 Aug 197543.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zica
22 Nov 197543.6SucceededBishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 May 200169.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Belesasa
12 Mar 201987.0DiedTitular Bishop of Belesasa

MicroData Summary for Joachim Mbadu Kikhela Kupika
Bishop Joachim Mbadu Kikhela Kupika (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Belesasa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhuka Kumbi
Ordained DeaconMinor Seminary, Mbata Kiela
Ordained PriestKangu
Death PlaceHospital, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Mar 2019

Quantcast