Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Marie Van den Bosch, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Matadi

Titular Bishop of Tubusuptu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1894BornAntwerpen, Belgium
1 Nov 191420.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
28 Dec 191925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jun 193843.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Jun 193843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philae
1 Aug 193844.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philae
10 Nov 195965.3AppointedBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Dec 196571.4ResignedBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Dec 196571.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubusuptu
26 Mar 197378.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Marie Van den Bosch:
Bishop Alphonse Marie Van den Bosch C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Matadi

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 58
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013