Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Richard Field, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ondo, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1907Born
10 Jun 193426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
16 Jan 195850.5AppointedBishop of Ondo, Nigeria
27 Apr 195850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ondo, Nigeria
31 May 197668.9ResignedBishop of Ondo, Nigeria
3 Feb 198880.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ondo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for William Richard Field
Bishop William Richard Field S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchull, Ireland

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast