Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William John Kenny

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1853Born
15 Jan 187925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
15 Mar 190248.4AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
18 May 190248.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
24 Oct 191360.0DiedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for William John Kenny
Bishop William John Kenny (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelhi, NY

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 24
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018