Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Michael Haid (Hite), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA

Titular Bishop of Messene

Abbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1849Born
12 Sep 186819.1EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Sep 186920.1Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Oct 187223.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Dec 187223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Jul 188535.9SelectedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
30 Aug 188536.1ConfirmedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
26 Nov 188536.3InstalledAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
4 Feb 188838.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
4 Feb 188838.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
1 Jul 188838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
15 Jul 188839.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA
8 Jun 191060.8AppointedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
24 Jul 192475.0DiedVicar Apostolic of North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Michael Haid (Hite) (VIAF: 6367341)
Bishop Leo Michael Haid (Hite) O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of North Carolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUnity Township, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceBelmont, Territorial Abbey of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina
Buried Place (Original)Abbey, Cemetery, Belmont, Territorial Abbey of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast