Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Teresina

Archidioecesis Teresianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 August 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Piaui
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 26,495 (10,233 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste IV
  • Web Site: http://www.arqui-the.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, C.P. 70, 64001-970 Teresina; Av. Frei Serafim 3200, 64001-500 Teresina, PI, Brazil
  • Telephone: (086)3222-4350
  • Fax: 3221-2221

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Piaui
20 February 1902ErectedDiocese of São Luís do Maranhão Diocese of Piaui (erected)
18 June 1920Territory LostDiocese of Piaui Territorial Prelature of Bom Jesus do Piauí (erected)
16 December 1944Territory LostDiocese of Piaui Diocese of Parnaíba (erected)
16 December 1944Territory LostDiocese of Piaui Diocese of Oeiras (erected)
Diocese of Teresina
16 December 1944Name ChangedDiocese of Piaui Diocese of Teresina
Archdiocese of Teresina
9 August 1952ElevatedDiocese of Teresina Archdiocese of Teresina
28 October 1974Territory LostDiocese of Oeiras
Archdiocese of Teresina
Diocese of Picos (erected)
12 June 1975Territory LostDiocese of Parnaíba
Archdiocese of Teresina
Diocese of Campo Maior (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Teresina
194917320055614ap1951
Archdiocese of Teresina
1966550,000600,00091.7%30144412,50019ap1967
1968568,254.0%34154901811821ap1971
1976653,834667,04298.0%34185212,5732111129ap1977
1980549,000560,00098.0%30164611,934198624ap1981
1990754,000775,00097.3%34245813,0005611630ap1991
1999986,1081,183,32783.3%60268611,46614516447ap2000
2000986,1081,183,32783.3%59268511,60113016848ap2001
2001986,1081,052,56493.7%59298811,20513316851ap2002
2002957,8331,052,56491.0%61278810,88413116852ap2003
2003958,1971,052,56491.0%65248910,76622816853ap2004
20101,018,0001,195,00085.2%86321188,627193416959ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013