Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Pio Ramolo, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Goré, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1952 Born
30 Jul 197825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Nov 199845.9AppointedBishop of Goré, Chad
14 Feb 199946.1Ordained BishopBishop of Goré, Chad

MicroData Summary for Rosario Pio Ramolo
Bishop Rosario Pio Ramolo O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Goré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimosano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast