Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Hugh MacDonald

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Mediana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1881Born
21 Dec 190625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
11 Aug 193453.3AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
25 Oct 193453.5Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
12 Dec 193655.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
12 Dec 193655.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
5 Mar 193856.9SucceededArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
11 Aug 196483.3RetiredArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
11 Aug 196483.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mediana
17 Jan 196583.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Hugh MacDonald
Archbishop John Hugh MacDonald (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaryvale, Nova Scotia

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast