Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Marius Bernard

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1885BornBeurières
11 Jul 190924.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 193348.9AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
22 Feb 193449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
18 Nov 195974.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Marius Bernard:
Bishop Henri-Marius Bernard (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013