Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin Patrick Dowling, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Rustenburg, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1944 Born
9 Jul 196723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Dec 199046.8AppointedBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa
27 Jan 199146.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa
25 Nov 202076.7RetiredBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Kevin Patrick Dowling
Bishop Kevin Patrick Dowling C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rustenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePretoria
Ordained BishopMission St. Joseph, Phoken

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rustenburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,598
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Feb 2021

Quantcast