Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mansuet Dela Biyase

Deceased

Bishop of Eshowe, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1933Born
10 Jul 196026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mariannhill, South Africa
28 Feb 197541.3AppointedBishop of Eshowe, South Africa
28 Jun 197541.7Ordained BishopBishop of Eshowe, South Africa
1 Jul 200571.7DiedBishop of Eshowe, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Mansuet Dela Biyase
Bishop Mansuet Dela Biyase (born , died ) Bishop of Eshowe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIxopo

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast