Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John March

Deceased

Bishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1863Born
16 Mar 189935.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 190643.1AppointedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
4 Nov 190643.3Ordained BishopBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada
12 Jan 194076.4DiedBishop of Harbour Grace, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for John March
Bishop John March (born , died ) Bishop of Harbour Grace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorthern Bay

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast