Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Walter Hickey

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Rusuccuru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1914Born
7 Jun 194126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
5 Jan 196853.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA
5 Jan 196853.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
14 Mar 196853.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
16 Jan 199075.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA
6 Oct 199984.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Dennis Walter Hickey
Bishop Dennis Walter Hickey (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDansville
Ordained PriestRochester, NY, Diocese of Rochester, New York

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast