Catholic-Hierarchy DC

St. Gregorio Giovanni Gasparo Cardinal Barbarigo

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1625BornVenice
21 Dec 165530.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 165731.8AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
29 Jul 165731.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
5 Apr 166034.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 166034.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
24 Mar 166438.5AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
13 Sep 167751.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 Jun 169771.7DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
6 Jul 1771Beatified
26 May 1960Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Gregorio Giovanni Gasparo Barbarigo:
St. Gregorio Giovanni Gasparo Cardinal Barbarigo (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
  • a cardinal for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1660
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 113, and Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 2 Jan 2015