Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh MacDonald

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Diana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1699BornMorar, Inverness
18 Sep 172526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Scotland, Great Britain
12 Feb 173132.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Feb 173132.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
18 Oct 173132.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
12 Mar 177374.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh MacDonald
Bishop Hugh MacDonald (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195, and Page 455
  • opd/c1: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016