Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Gordon

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1665Born
169226.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 170540.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain
21 Aug 170540.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis
11 Apr 170641.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis
23 Oct 171853.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Scotland, Great Britain
23 Jul 172762.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Mar 174681.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Gordon
Bishop James Gordon (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lowland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlastirum, Enzie, Banffshire
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained Bishop(in secret), Montefiascone, Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
Death PlaceThornhill, Perthshire
Buried Place (Original)Innerpeffrey, Perthshire

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,030
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 7, Number 2
  • b: The Catholic Hierarchy of Scotland, Page 10, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast