Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Scott

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1772BornChapelford, Enzie
25 Mar 179523.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 182755.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
13 Feb 182755.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
21 Sep 182856.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
20 Sep 183260.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Oct 184573.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Dec 184674.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Scott:
Bishop Andrew Scott (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013