Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Remigio Gandásegui y Gorrochátegui

Deceased

Archbishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1871Born
27 May 189423.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 190534.2AppointedPrelate of Ciudad Real, Spain
27 Mar 190534.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Dora
16 Jul 190534.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dora
28 May 191443.3AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
22 Apr 192049.2AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
20 Oct 192049.7InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
16 May 193766.3DiedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Remigio Gandásegui y Gorrochátegui
Archbishop Remigio Gandásegui y Gorrochátegui (born , died ) Archbishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaldácano

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast