Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Foylan

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1907Born
5 Jul 193124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
8 Dec 196457.4AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Mar 196557.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
28 May 197668.9DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Foylan
Bishop Michael Foylan (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShettleston, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestOur Lady of Perpetual Succour, Church, Kinnoull, Perthshire, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, King's Gate, Aberdeen, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Ninian, Cemetery, Tynet, Moray, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast