Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús José Herrera Quiñonez

Bishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1961 BornMexicali
20 Dec 198726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mexicali, Baja California Norte, México
27 Oct 201149.9AppointedBishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua, México
15 Dec 201150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús José Herrera Quiñonez:
Bishop Jesús José Herrera Quiñonez (born ) Bishop of Nuevo Casas Grandes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuevo Casas Grandes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Nov 2011
  • c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013