Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamín Jiménez Hernández

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1938Born
28 Jul 196325.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 198951.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
13 May 198951.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
29 Jun 198951.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum
4 Oct 199355.5AppointedBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
18 Mar 201172.9ResignedBishop of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México
26 Nov 202082.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Culiacán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Benjamín Jiménez Hernández
Bishop Benjamín Jiménez Hernández (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Culiacán

EventPlace
Birth PlacePénjamo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Culiacán, Diocese of Culiacán, Sinaloa
Death PlaceSan José, Hospital, Hermosillo, Archdiocese of Hermosillo, Sonora

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,460
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Nov 2020

Quantcast