Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Todisco Grande

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1789BornBisceglie
9 Apr 181424.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 183343.9SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
20 Jan 183444.2ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
26 Jan 183444.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
20 Dec 184859.1SelectedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
20 Apr 184959.4ConfirmedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy
13 May 187282.5DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Todisco Grande:
Bishop Leonardo Todisco Grande (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano e Cerignola

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 125
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013