Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnello Giuseppe d’Auria Loffredo

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1786³BornNapoli
22 Dec 181024.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 183447.5SelectedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
23 Jun 183447.9ConfirmedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
30 Jun 183447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
20 Feb 186073.5DiedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agnello Giuseppe d’Auria Loffredo:
Bishop Agnello Giuseppe d’Auria Loffredo (born , died ) Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013