Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Grisologo Basetti

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1790BornVairo
18 Dec 181323.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Parma, Italy
11 Mar 181524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Parma, Italy
19 Dec 183444.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
28 Dec 183444.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
22 Jun 184352.6AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
13 Aug 184352.7InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
16 Jun 185766.5DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Grisologo Basetti:
Bishop Pier Grisologo Basetti (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 122, and Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013