Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Giuseppe Ugo

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1775BornGirgenti
9 Mar 179924.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 183863.9SelectedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
18 Feb 183964.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
19 May 183964.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
14 Aug 1843³68.6DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Giuseppe Ugo:
Archbishop Nicola Giuseppe Ugo (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013