Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Stephen Sullivan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1929BornKalamazoo, MI
4 Jun 195525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
25 Jul 197243.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
25 Jul 197243.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccesi
21 Sep 197243.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siccesi
29 Mar 198555.6AppointedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
30 May 198555.8InstalledBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
18 Mar 200272.6ResignedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
12 Jun 200676.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for James Stephen Sullivan:
Bishop James Stephen Sullivan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fargo

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015