Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Vincent Donovan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1924Born
20 May 195025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
15 Jun 197146.7AppointedBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
21 Jul 197146.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
22 Nov 199470.2RetiredBishop of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA
27 Apr 201186.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Vincent Donovan
Bishop Paul Vincent Donovan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalamazoo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBernard, IA

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast