Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentine Tsamma Seane

Bishop of Gaborone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1966 BornLobaste
19 Mar 199427.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 200639.2IncardinatedPriest of Gaborone, Botswana
5 Feb 200942.3AppointedBishop of Gaborone, Botswana
25 Apr 200942.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gaborone, Botswana

MicroData Summary for Valentine Tsamma Seane:
Bishop Valentine Tsamma Seane (born ) Bishop of Gaborone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gaborone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013