Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Graham

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Sabrata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1913BornPhiladelphia
26 Feb 193824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Nov 196350.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Nov 196350.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
7 Jan 196450.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata
8 Nov 198875.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Aug 200086.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Graham:
Bishop John Joseph Graham (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013