Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Nicholas Lohmuller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Ramsbiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1919Born
3 Jun 194424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Feb 197050.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Feb 197050.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramsbiria
2 Apr 197050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramsbiria
11 Oct 199475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Jan 201797.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin Nicholas Lohmuller (VIAF: 53695597)
Bishop Martin Nicholas Lohmuller (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceSt. Joseph’s Manor, Meadowbrook, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 28 Nov 2019

Quantcast