Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Thomas Hughes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1920Born
31 May 194726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jun 197655.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Jun 197655.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
21 Jul 197655.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
11 Dec 198666.0AppointedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
5 Feb 198766.2InstalledBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
8 Jul 199776.6ResignedBishop of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
25 Dec 201292.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Thomas Hughes
Bishop Edward Thomas Hughes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metuchen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLansdowne

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: CB, 26 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast