Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amédée (Antoine-Marie) Grab, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1930Born
8 Sep 195020.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jun 195424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Feb 198757.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
3 Feb 198757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenae
12 Apr 198757.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenae
9 Nov 199565.7AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
26 Nov 199565.8InstalledBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
8 Jun 199868.3SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Jun 199868.3ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
23 Aug 199868.5InstalledBishop of Chur, Switzerland
5 Feb 200777.0RetiredBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 May 201989.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Amédée (Antoine-Marie) Grab
Bishop Amédée (Antoine-Marie) Grab O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwyz
Death PlaceRoveredo

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2007
  • d: CB, 20 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jul 2019

Quantcast