Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal Journet

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1891BornGeneva
15 Jul 191726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
15 Feb 196574.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Furnos Minor
20 Feb 196574.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Furnos Minor
22 Feb 196574.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
22 Feb 196574.0Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197382.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
15 Apr 197584.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

MicroData Summary for Charles Journet:
Charles Cardinal Journet (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015