Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Jean César Scarcella, C.R.A.

Abbot of Saint-Maurice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1951 BornMontreux
5 Oct 198533.7ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
21 May 198836.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
5 Aug 198937.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
31 Mar 199038.2Ordained PriestPriest of Swiss Congregation of Canons Regular of Saint Maurice of Agaune
10 Apr 201563.2SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
22 May 201563.4ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
1 Aug 201563.5InstalledAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean César Scarcella:
Abbot Jean César Scarcella C.R.A. (born ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Saint-Maurice.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2015
  • b: CB, 22 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015