Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Farine

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Tragurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1940 Born
27 Jun 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
12 Aug 199656.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
12 Aug 199656.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tragurium
20 Oct 199656.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tragurium
30 Jun 201575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Pierre Farine
Bishop Pierre Farine (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLocarno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,859
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast