Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Charrière

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1893Born
15 Jul 191723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
20 Oct 194552.1AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
21 Nov 194552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
29 Dec 197077.3RetiredBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
11 Jul 197682.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for François Charrière
Bishop François Charrière (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerniat

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018