Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain de Raemy

Auxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

Titular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1959 BornBarcelona, Spain
25 Oct 198627.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
30 Nov 201354.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland
30 Nov 201354.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania
11 Jan 201454.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Alain de Raemy:
Bishop Alain de Raemy (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 30 Nov 2013
  • c2: CB, 7 Jan 2014
  • c34: CB, 10 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014