Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude d’Angennes

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1538Born
6 Oct 157840.1AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
8 Feb 157940.4Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
28 Sep 158749.0AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
15 May 160162.7DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Claude d’Angennes (VIAF: 39531008)
Bishop Claude d’Angennes (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRambouillet
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceLe Mans, Diocese of Le Mans

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162, and Page 261
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast